Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Richardson, Robert Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Holt, Ray Leonard, Villanueva, Robert Charles, represented by George M. Ranalli, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, David M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Decision and Order |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Short Trial - Jury Vacated |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joinder Vacated Judge: Jones, David M |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Vacated Judge: Jones, David M |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Jones, David M |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joinder Vacated Judge: Jones, David M |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Defendants Nicole Michelle Woford and Ray Leonard Holt's Notice to Withdraw Motion to Deem Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Requests for Admissions as Admitted Pursuant to NRCP 36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.