Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Benito, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lewis J. Gazda, against Huffman, Ashley, represented by Laina Tzvetansky, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wiese, Jerry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection to the Arbitration Commissioner's Report Plaintiff's Objection to the Arbitration Commissioner's Report Statements by counsel. COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. Counsel does not need to pay. Order to be submitted. Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
ADR Commissioners Report & Recommendations ADR Commissioner's Report and Recommendations |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Short Trial Setting | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Selection of Presiding Judge | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | demand for Jury Trial | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Trial De Novo Request for Trial Denovo |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.