Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leon, Avimael, Villasenor, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthew Cox, Esq, against Jennings, Edward, Sr., Jennings, Mary Ann, represented by Stephen M. Dixon, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment Mr. Dixon argued an independent agent for State Farm canceled the policy, that was never reported to State Farm; they would never see that that happened. The action is against the insurance company and the individual agent who canceled the policy. COURT NOTED there was a point where it should have been realized there were negative developments. Mr. Cox argued the firm not picking up the defense does not prevent them from filing any pleadings in the action, they waited over a year. They knew about of the case, they filed a 10 day extension and hired a private investigator; his clients have not been compensated. COURT ORDERED, Motion DENIED; State Farm was fully on notice as to what was happening but didn't take the steps to protect themselves. The Court would be taking away a judgment that Pltf. legitimately obtained. Mr. Cox is to prepare the Order, provide a copy to opposing counsel for review as to form and content and return it back to the Court within 10 days. Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance fee Disclosure | |
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Move Hearing Date from 01/02/18 to 01/23/18 | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment by Default Notice of Entry of Default Judgment |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.