Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tran, Loi T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marjorie L. Hauf, against Faye, Pape Ibrahima, represented by Mark E. Trafton, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Scotti, Richard F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Notice of Entry of Order to Dismiss With Prejudice |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order For Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendants pape Ibrahima Faye and Whittlesea Blue Cab Company | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Pretrial Disclosures |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial to October 29, 2018 Stack | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.