Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilson, Terry, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Williams, Brian, Sr., Offender Management Division, Nevada State Of, represented by Allison L. Herr, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - Previously Decided Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mr. D. Wilson, Deputy Attorney General present. Court advised no arguments will be heard on this matter. As to the motion for extension filed by the Attorney General set on 10/25/16, COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. CONTINUED TO 10/27/16 9:00 AM
Judge: Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Good and Work Time, Meritorious Award calculations (NRS 34.724, subsection 2(c) ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.