Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mccune, Sherry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard A. Harris, against Gonzalez-Munoz, Anna, represented by Trevor L. Atkin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Timothy C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Upon The Verdict |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Verified Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Pursuant to NRS 18.005 and NRS 18.110 or, in the Alternative, Motion to Retax Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions APPEARANCES CONTINUED: Benjamin P. Cloward, Esq. present for Pltf. Hearing held live and by BlueJeans remote conferencing. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Arguments by Mr. Cloward and Mr. Canfield. COURT ORDERED, Request for Fees GRANTED based upon offer of judgment; however, will review matter to determine the amount. Decision pending. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS PURSUANT TO NRS 18.005 AND NRS 18.110 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO RETAX Arguments by Mr. Canfield; by Mr. Leavitt and Mr. Cloward. COURT ORDERED, will not award costs for copies; non-testifying doctors limited to $1,500.00; testifying doctors will be given their charge; will permit IT tech support. Prevailing party to prepare the order. Mr. Canfield advised certain issue may impact possible new trial and will file motion in that regard. Court directed matter addressed by motion. Proposed order(s) to be submitted to DC16Inbox@clarkcountycourts.us. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order: [88] Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (Fees Amount Issue) After review and consideration of the points and authorities on file herein, and oral argument of counsel, the Court determined as follows: Plaintiff s Motion for Attorney s Fees and Costs shall be GRANTED. The Court notes that Mr. Cloward is an experienced trial attorney. However, the Court has determined a reasonable hourly rate is $500 per hour. Therefore, Attorney s Fees shall be awarded as follows: Mr. Cloward- $500 per hour x 139.2 hours = $69,600 Mr. Leavitt- $500 per hour x 141.2 hours = $70,600 Total Amount of Attorney s Fees Awarded = $140,200 Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Sherry McCune shall prepare a detailed Order, Findings of Facts, and Conclusions of Law, based not only on the foregoing Minute Order but also on the record on file herein. This is to be submitted to adverse counsel for review and approval and/or submission of a competing Order or objections prior to submitting to the Court for review and signature. CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users on this case in the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System. Judge: Williams, Timothy C.) Minute Order: [88] Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs (Fees Amount Issue |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 101 [101] NEO Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order re: Hearing on 3/24/22 at 9:05 a.m. Department 16 Formal Request to Appear Remotely Effective December 20, 2021, Department 16 has relocated to Courtroom 16C. The court utilizes and prefers BlueJeans for remote conferencing on all status checks, Rule 16 conferences, and unopposed motions wherein you participate by phone or through an internet enabled device. Live appearances for OPPOSED motions are now allowed. Counsel may still appear via BlueJeans audio/video for opposed motions if they prefer. Please be sure to check in with the Courtroom Clerk at 8:55 a.m. on the date of your hearing. The call-in number or website to connect is: Telephone: Dial: 1-408-419-1715 Meeting ID: 305 354 001 Participant Passcode: 2258 Smartphone/Computer: Website: https://bluejeans.com/305354001/2258 If you appear by phone, please bear in mind: first, dial the telephone number, then meeting ID followed by #, and finally the participate passcode followed by #; secondly, dial *4 to unmute when you are ready to do so. If you appear by smartphone or computer, please bear in mind: enter the website address in your device s browser exactly as show above and follow the instructions on screen; optionally, download the BlueJeans app as indicated on this same website. If you wish to test your audio/video in advance of the hearing, please visit https://bluejeans.com/111. Protocol each participant will be required to follow: Place your telephone on mute while waiting for your matter to be called. Do not place the conference on hold as it may play wait/hold music to others. Identify yourself before speaking each and every time as a record is being made. Wait for the line to clear before speaking as the conference audio is one-way. Be mindful of background noises and echoing from using multiple devices. BlueJeans chat will not be available while court is in session. If you need to report an issue affecting your ability to appear, please send an email marked urgent to the following addresses: JEA, Lynn Berkheimer [Dept16EA@clarkcountycourts.us]; Law Clerk, Michael Holthus [Dept16LC@clarkcountycourts.us]; Court Clerk, Chris CJ Darling [DarlingC@clarkcountycourts.us] CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users on this case in the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 100 [100] Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Verified Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Pursuant to NRS 18.005 and NRS 18.110 or, in the Alternative, Motion to Retax Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order re: Hearing on 3/17/22 at 9:05 a.m. Department 16 Formal Request to Appear Remotely Effective December 20, 2021, Department 16 has relocated to Courtroom 16C. The court utilizes and prefers BlueJeans for remote conferencing on all status checks, Rule 16 conferences, and unopposed motions wherein you participate by phone or through an internet enabled device. Live appearances for OPPOSED motions are now allowed. Counsel may still appear via BlueJeans audio/video for opposed motions if they prefer. Please be sure to check in with the Courtroom Clerk at 8:55 a.m. on the date of your hearing. The call-in number or website to connect is: Telephone: Dial: 1-408-419-1715 Meeting ID: 305 354 001 Participant Passcode: 2258 Smartphone/Computer: Website: https://bluejeans.com/305354001/2258 If you appear by phone, please bear in mind: first, dial the telephone number, then meeting ID followed by #, and finally the participate passcode followed by #; secondly, dial *4 to unmute when you are ready to do so. If you appear by smartphone or computer, please bear in mind: enter the website address in your device s browser exactly as show above and follow the instructions on screen; optionally, download the BlueJeans app as indicated on this same website. If you wish to test your audio/video in advance of the hearing, please visit https://bluejeans.com/111. Protocol each participant will be required to follow: Place your telephone on mute while waiting for your matter to be called. Do not place the conference on hold as it may play wait/hold music to others. Identify yourself before speaking each and every time as a record is being made. Wait for the line to clear before speaking as the conference audio is one-way. Be mindful of background noises and echoing from using multiple devices. BlueJeans chat will not be available while court is in session. If you need to report an issue affecting your ability to appear, please send an email marked urgent to the following addresses: JEA, Lynn Berkheimer [Dept16EA@clarkcountycourts.us]; Law Clerk, Michael Holthus [Dept16LC@clarkcountycourts.us]; Court Clerk, Chris CJ Darling [DarlingC@clarkcountycourts.us] CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users on this case in the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Doc ID# 99 [99] Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.