Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Denson, Dinina, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ryan M. Anderson, against Payless Shoesource Inc, represented by Josh C. Aicklen, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Israel, Ronald J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael, Ronald J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff, Dinina Denson's Motion for Spoliation of Evidence |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Mr. Aicklen stated he had nothing to add stating the duty is an issue of law for the Court to decide. Arguments by Mr. Anderson in opposition of the motion. Colloquy regarding the sidewalk outside the premises, curb and street where Plaintiff fell. Upon Court's inquiry of discovery, Mr. Anderson noted they have not disclosed experts yet. Mr. Aicklen noted discovery was done. COURT ORDERED, Matter CONTINUED to chambers for Decision. Court to re-read Coblentz v. Hotel Employees & Restaurant Employees Union Welfare Fund. 01/25/17 CHAMBERS DECISION RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF DINIA DENSON AS TO ALL CLAIMS Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Defendant Payless Shoesource, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Dinina Denson as to all Claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.