Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robert S. Qualey filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Pro Se, against Troy Capital Llc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cory, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCory, Kenneth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court Dallas Sisolak's Appeal from Lower Court Ms. Sisolak argued she is not disputing she owes the debt, but that the debt is owed to Chase not Troy Capital. Ms. Sisolak further argued the chain of title was broken. Mr. Qualey argued the actual transfer was in 2009. Colloquy and review of documents. COURT ORDERED, Dallas Sisolak's Appeal from Lower Court DENIED and the Lower Court's Ruling AFFIRMED. Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Appeal From Lower Court Order Scheduling Hearing on Appeal from Justice Court |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply Appellant's Reply to Respondents Answering Brief |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Answering Brief Respondent's Answer Brief |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Appellate Brief |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Appeal From Lower Court Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Justice Court Appeal |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of the Evidence | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Appeal from Lower Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.