Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ups Ground Freight Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tamela L. Kahle, against Laturno, Joseph G, represented by Adam H. Springel, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Consolidate | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate [A-15-729181-C/A-15-729475-C] COURT ORDERS, Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate [A-15-729181-C/A-15-729475-C] GRANTED. **** ALL MINUTE ORDERS, PLEADING/FILINGS TO BE ENTERED UNDER A729181**** Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Consolidate | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Plaintiff UPS Ground Freight, Inc.'s Supplemental List of Witnesses and Exhibits |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses Plaintiff UPS Ground Freight, Inc.'s List of Witnesses and Exhibits to be Produced at Early Arbitration Conference Pursuant to NAR 11 |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Defendant Joseph G. Laturno's Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.