Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wmcv Phase 2 Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Jason M. Gerber, Esq, against Jatex International Inc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther Landlord Tenant |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus 18% |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Default Judgment | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prove Up Plaintiff's Motion for Prove-Up Hearing Barrett Seitz, present telephonically SWORN and TESTIFIED. COURT ORDERED, EXHIBITS admitted (see worksheet). Following representations of counsel, and testimony, COURT stated FINDINGS, including Pltf s counsel having met the Brunzell facts to substantiate the request for fees and FURTHER ORDERED, Default judgment AWARDED as follows: Principle and Pre-judgment interest at the contractual rate of 18% per annum for a total of $467,454.97, Costs in the amount of $620.06, Attorney's fees in the amount of $2,500.00, and Post-judgment interest to accrue on the total judgment at the contractual rate of 18% per annum until paid or otherwise satisfied. Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prove Up Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re-Notice of Prove-Up Hearing |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice to Vacate Prove Up Hearing | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Memorandum of Costs |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Ex-Parte Application for Default Judgment |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Prove-Up Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.