Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wood, Britt, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jason W. Barrus, against Liu, Yan Hong, represented by George M. Ranalli, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bare, Rob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Judge Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Dismiss with Prejudice | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated - per Judge Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Rescheduling Pretrial Conference Order Rescheduling Calendar Call |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Second Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint Colloquy held between the Court and counsels. Mr. Barrus reiterated his arguments as contained in the Motion for Leave To Amend the Complaint. Ms. Hanlon argument in opposition; however, she requested the trial moved if the motion is granted. Mr. Barrus noted that Ms. Hanlon should put her request for trial continuance in writing. Mr. Fowler stated his position is that there is evidence of undue delay, explaining same. COURT ORDERED, MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ALLOWED IN ITS ENTIRETY. COURT DIRECTED Mr. Barrus to file the Amended Complaint by 5:00 P.M. on 2/10/17 and the Answer is to be filed within ten (10) days thereafter. Discussion held as to Ms. Hanlon's request to move the trial and COURT STATED that seems reasonable. All counsels agreed they will require four or five days for trial completion. COURT ORDERED the 3/30/17 Pretrial/Calendar Call and 4/17/17 Jury Trial VACATED and to be RESET for the September 2017 Jury Trial Stack. COURT ADVISED a Trial Setting Order will be issued by Chambers. BEING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 2017 JURY TRIAL STACK Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order At the request of Court, for judicial economy, the Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint currently scheduled for January 31, 2017, is RESCHEDULED to February 7, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder(s) of: Jason W. Barrus, Esq., George M. Ranalli, Esq. (Ranalli Z F & M), and Justin S. Gourley, Esq. (Goates Law Offcs) / (dd-1/24/17) Judge: Bare, Rob |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.