Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bohannan, Dakwan, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Valladares, Joseph, Allstate Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silver, Abbi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate Certification of Blocked Trust Account |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Case reassigned from Judge Abbi Silver Dept 15 |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Mr. Golightly's office has informed this court that it would provide proof to this court shortly. Accordingly, COURT ORDERED, this matter is hereby CONTINUED for 30 days, to May 11, 2015, in chambers, for a status check regarding the blocked account. CONTINUED TO: 5/11/15 9:00 A.M. Judge: Bonaventure, Joseph T. |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Compromising Minor s Claim |
|
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Opened | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.