Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jimenez, Miguel Angel, filed a(n) Civil Writ case represented by Pro Se, against Neven, Dwight, represented by Catherine M Cortez, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Escobar, Adriana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Writ |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 11 Reassigned From Judge Bell - Dept 7 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order This matter came before the Court on Petitioner's Writ filed December 26, 2013, Order filed January 8, 2014 and Response filed February 25, 2014. The Court DENIED the writ because Petitioner has failed to demonstrate that NDOC improperly computed his time served pursuant to the Judgment of Conviction. Additionally, the Court DENIED the State s request for forfeiture pursuant to NRS 209.451. Counsel for the State to prepare the order and submit to chambers. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to Counsel via fax and Petitioner via USPS as follows: Miguel Jimenez #1097375 High Desert State Prison POB 650 Indian Springs, NV 89070-0650 Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vacated Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Good and Work Time, Meritorious Award Calculations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.