Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmanus, Roger T, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Joseph L. Benson Ii, against Healthworks Colonic Health Center, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw As Counsel Benson & Bingham's Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record for Plaintiff |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Chris Marquez as a Defendant, to Disqualify Chris Marquez From Representing Healthworks Colonic Health Center as A Pro Se Litigant, and for Sanctions Against Chris Marquez for the Unauthorized Practice of Law | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Plaintff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint To Add Chris Marquez As A Defendant, To Disqualify Chris Marquez From Representing Healthworks Colonic Health Center As A Pro Se Litigant, And For Sanctions Against Chris Marquez For The Unauthorized Practice Of Law Arguments by Mr. Mortier that Mr. Marquez cannot represent a corporation. Arguments by Mr. Marquez that he is a sole proprietor and does not have a corporation. COURT ORDERED, Plaintff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint To Add Chris Marquez As A Defendant, To Disqualify Chris Marquez From Representing Healthworks Colonic Health Center As A Pro Se Litigant, And For Sanctions Against Chris Marquez For The Unauthorized Practice Of Law GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART; Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint To Add Chris Marquez As A Defendant, GRANTED; To Disqualify Chris Marquez From Representing Healthworks Colonic Health Center As A Pro Se Litigant, DENIED; And For Sanctions Against Chris Marquez For The Unauthorized Practice Of Law DENIED. Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Vacated - Duplicate Entry Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint To Add Chris Marquez As A Defendant, To Disqualify Chris Marquez From Representing Healthworks Colonic Health Center As A Pro Se Litigant, And For Sanctions Against Chris Marquez For The Unauthorized Practice Of Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.