Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Platte River Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Peter Dubowsky, against Krulee, Lawrence A, Meyer, Richard G, Take It For Granite Too, represented by Antony M Santos, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeRenewal Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction Of Platte River Insurance Company's Judgment And Finding Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law Against Defendant Lawrence A. Krulee Entered On July 7, 2015 |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment Cross-Complaintant Lawrence A. Krulee's Assignment of Judgment Against Cross-Defendant Richard G. Meyer to Plaintiff |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment Order Granting Defendant Krulee's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Richard Meyer |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment Judgment and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.