Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Coleman, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by William S. Skupa, against Nevada State Of, represented by Mercedes Menendez, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Villani, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2012 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Villani to Judge Holthus |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry Of Order | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order (1) Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; (2) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration; and (3) Denying Plaintiffs' Petition to Stay | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Plaintiffs' Motion for Rehearing and Reconsideration regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . . . Decision on Stay The Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and Petition to Stay came before this Court on the December 18, 2013, Chamber Calendar. The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and papers on file herein, FINDS that the COURT has not yet made a decision granting the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as supplemental briefing was ordered on the matter. There can be no rehearing of a decision that has not yet been made by the COURT. A District Court may reconsider a previously decided issue if substantially different evidence is subsequently introduced or if the prior decision was clearly erroneous. Masonry & Tile Contractors Ass'n of Southern Nevada v. Jolley, Urga & Wirth, Ltd., 113 Nev. 737,741, 941 P.2d 486, 489 (1976). In Coleman Davis' Motion for Reconsideration, Coleman Davis did not argue any new facts or law and did not introduce any substantially different evidence. Therefore, the Court FINDS that even if the decision had been entered the Plaintiff failed to present new authority demonstrate that the COURT'S initial decision was clearly erroneous. The COURT also FINDS that NRS 209.243 requires an inmate to file his grievances within six (6) months. The time to file a civil claim is not altered in any way by NRS 209.243. Inmates still possess two years in which they can properly file a claim against the State. Additionally, the COURT FINDS the statue is rationally related to a legitimate government interest. Therefore, COURT ORDERED the State of Nevada's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED as MOOT because the COURT has not yet entered a decision in this matter. Further, COURT ORDERED the Petition to Stay is DENIED. Counsel for the State if Nevada is directed to submit a proposed order consistent with the foregoing within ten (10) days after counsel is notified of the ruling and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved pursuant to EDCR 7.21. Such Order should set forth a synopsis of the supporting reasons proffered to the Court in briefing and reflect the Court's minutes from the October 9, 2013 hearing. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder of the Attorney General. Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decision on Stay
Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion For Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion for Rehearing and Reconsideration Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Points and Aurthorities Regarding Staying this Lawsuit Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Rehearing and Reconsideration Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Regarding Defendants' Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Rehearing and Reconsideration Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Points and Authorities Regarding Staying This Lawsuit |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Mailing | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.