Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roger, David, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by Steven B Wolfson, against Nevada State Of, Justices Courts Clark County, Eighth Judicial District Court, Cortez Masto, Catherine, Clark County Of, (total of 5) See All represented by Catherine M Cortez, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wall, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order To Statistically Close Case |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
NV Supreme Court Clerks Certificate/Judgment - Affirmed Nevada Supreme Court Clerk's Certificate Judgment - Affirmed |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Commissioners Decision on Request for Exemption - Granted Commissioner s Decision on Request for Exemption |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of order | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Appeal Statement | |
March 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Transcript of Proceedings Transcript of: Hearing Re: Petition for Declaratory Relief |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Re: Petition for Declaratory Relief [Paula Walsh, Judicial Executive Assistant (Department XX), recorded this matter.] Mr. Owens advised Pltf. had no objection to Justice Court taking pleas; they only want to make sure there will be no collateral attacks because Justice Court took a plea. Colloquy regarding whether the Supreme Court had need to clarify this issue. Ms. Davis advised Defts' Opposition was filed 02/02/11, but the courtesy copy was delivered to Department XXX as this matter was originally set in that department; COURT SO NOTED. Further arguments by counsel regarding jurisdiction; whether Justice Court Justices would be sitting as Special Masters for the purpose of taking pleas for District Court. COURT NOTED the Supreme Court might deny the Petition as there were not yet any complaints from criminal defendants whose plea was taken by a Justice Court Justice. COURT FINDS the Justice Court Justices are sitting as Special Masters when they render sentencing against a criminal defendant. Additional arguments by counsel regarding Justice Court Justices not having been elected to sit as Special Masters. COURT ORDERED Petition DENIED. Attorney General's office to prepare Order. Mr. Owens advised he would request a copy of the transcript; COURT SO NOTED. Judge: Estes, Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.