Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valenzuela, Manuel, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Mccarty, Debra, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wall, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2010 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Release of Funds From Blocked Account Order to Release Blocked Trust Account |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Supplement to Petition to Release Blocked Trust Account |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition to Disburse Money From Compromise of Minors Claim Petition To Release Blocked Trust Account |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 4 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Redact Social Security Numbers |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Motion to Redact Social Security Number | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended Notice | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account No proof filed. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Counsel to appear 1/13 if proof of blocked account not filed by 1/13. CONTINUED TO: 1/13/11 9:00 AM CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order to be placed in the attorney folder of Mr. Decastroverde. Judge: Bonaventure, Joseph T. |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Filed Under Seal Sealed awaiting order - Notice of Proof of Minor's Court Blocked Trust Accounts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.