Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coyne, Karen filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Philip R. Byrnes, against Bullocks, Leon, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wall, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2010 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeAppeal Reversed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change To Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth Judge: ChangeTo Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth |
|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 6 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Elissa F. Cadish |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao Dept 20 |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order of Reversal | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Reversal | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Appellants' Reply Brief |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Reply to Appellants' Opening Brief | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court Court noted it appears the other side made a good faith effort to enlarge time. COURT ORDERED, the respondent has until 11/19 to file answering brief, the appellant has until 12/3 to reply. Hearing set 12/9/10. CONTINUED TO: 12/9/10 9:00 AM Clerk's note: A copy of this minute order to be mailed to Leon Bullocks, Jr. ("A" Street address). Judge: Brennan, James |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Appellants' Opening Brief |
|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for Enlargement of Time to Serve Enlargement of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.