Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ruiz, Erik, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Ruiz, Rosamaria Esperanza, represented by Corinne M. Price, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Harter, Mathew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarter, Mathew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Review and Modify Child Support, for Attorney's Fees and Costs and all Other Related Relief Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Fifth Motion to Review and Modify Child Support and Countermotion for Limited Discovery, Sanctions, Fees and Costs Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Review and Modify Child Support, for Attorney's Fees and Costs and All Other Related Relief and Opposition to Defendant's Countermotion for Limited Discovery, Sanctions, Fees and Costs Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
December 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Exhibit Appendix to Supplement to Plaintiff s Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff s Motion to Review and Modify Child Support, For Attorney s Fees and Costs and All Other Related Relief and Opposition to Defendant s Countermotion for Limited Discovery, Sanctions, Fees and Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.