Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raco, Gregory, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rhonda K. Forsberg, Esq, against Raco, Lisa M, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Vincent Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department G Case reassigned from Judge Vincent Ochoa Dept S |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Amendeing Decree of Divorce to Restore Former Name | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Amending Decree of Divorce to Restore Former Name | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Attorney or Pro Per Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Continue Evidentiary Hearing | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue Evidentiary Hearing | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.