Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Israel, Ronald J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Matter Advanced. Court advised proof of deposit has been filed and ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was e-served to counsel. kt 8/23/2021. Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Doc ID# 3 [3] Proof of Blocked Trust |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.