Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jordan, Natassia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elaine Marzola, against Las Vegas Paving Corporation, represented by Phillip R Emerson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Hearing | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ADR - Action Required | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Defendant Las Vegas Paving Corporation's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses adn Deposition Testimony |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Discovery Order Discovery Order |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Arbitration Conference Notice of EAC |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Appointment of Arbitrator | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Vacated Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.