Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoskins, Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott Poisson, against Reyes, Miguel Angel, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kishner, Joanna S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKishner, Joanna S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 22 Reassigned From Judge Kishner - Dept 31 |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order (Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice) | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and order for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Bruce W. Kelley in Support of Evidentiary Hearing regarding Order to Show Cause | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Ariel C. Johnson | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief Defendant Adriana Valdez's Brief in Response to Order to Show Cause and Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Brief |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Brief in Response to Order to Show Cause | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry (Stipulation and Order to Consolidate) | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.