Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Liesl K Freedman, against U.S. Currency $41,405.00, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Hardy, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHardy, Joe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Compromise and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.