Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mayfield, Vasthi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jason M. Wiley, against Campania, Jessica, represented by S. Denise Mccurry, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Defendant Jessica Campania's SODW dismissal |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Presiding Short Trial Judges Bill for Fees and Costs Short Trial Judge's Bill for Fees and Expenses; Request for Further Instructions on Refund |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Short Trial - Jury Vacated |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorneys | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Following Inital Pre-Trial Conference; Renewed Deposits Request | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Selection of Presiding Judge | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Short Trial Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.