Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Todd Member, Llc, Sider, Herb, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Steven Yarmy, against The Law Office Of Shawn Dickerson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSturman, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Order of Dismissal and Order Closing Case |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 26 Case reassigned from Judge Kenneth Cory Dept 1 |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Why Matter Should Not Be Dismissed There being no appearances, COURT ORDERED, matter DISMISSED. Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order for Service by Publication The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Proposed Order for Service by Publication, which is rejected for the following reasons. First, the plaintiff has not filed any motion for service by publication. Second, NRCP(4)(i)'s 120-day period for service has expired without Plaintiff filing a motion to enlarge time to serve. Plaintiff's Complaint was filed December 21, 2012, making April 22 the last day to accomplish service without a motion to enlarge. Under NRCP 4(i), "[i]f a service of the summons and complaint is not made upon a defendant within 120 days after the filing of the complaint, the action shall be dismissed as to that defendant without prejudice upon the court's own initiative with notice to such party." Within two weeks of this order, Plaintiff shall file a motion explaining why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to accomplish service within the 120 days. This matter is set for hearing on the Court's oral argument calendar. 7/16/13 9:00 AM MOTION (WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED) CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to: Steven L. Yarmy, Esq. via e-mail. /mlt Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Service by Publication | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Due Diligence | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Service | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Service | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel The Law Firm of Todd Member, LLC & Herb Sider's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs The Law Firm of Todd Member, LLC & Herb Sider's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Motion having been duly filed and served, no opposition having been filed, pursuant to EDCR 2.20 and for good cause shown, COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. Mr. Breeden to prepare the Order which is to include his former client s last known address and any pending dates. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to: Adam Breeden, Esq. via e-mail. /mlt Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.