Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott, David C, against Battaile, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Midland Credit Management vs. Battaile, R. ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 9 2006 Type: 244220 - Judgment: Court Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.