Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daily, Kamilah Daniell, filed a(n) Intentional Misconduct case represented by Telia U. Williams, against Eastgate Realty Corporation, represented by Kent L. Ivey, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Crockett, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrockett, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryIntentional Misconduct |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents No one appearing, and the Court noting that as of 7/13/15, no settlement documents have been received or filed and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED to 7/28/15 at 9:00 A.M. Law Clerk to notify counsel. 7/28/15 @ 9:00 A.M. CONTINUED SAME CLERK'S NOTE: Law Clerk notified and spoke to Pltf's and Deft's counsel regarding the continuance. (tl) Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Hearing | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Check Status Check: Trial Readiness / Settlement Documents No parties present for Deft. or Pltf. MATTER TRAILED, for counsel to appear as there is an understanding the parties have reached an agreement. MATTER RECALLED, no parties present as before. The Court's Chambers received a call from Mr. Driscoll's office advising he had a Family Court appearance, however it is 10:50 A.M. and no counsel has appeared. The Court noted, the case has supposedly been settled and there is a Stipulation and Order enroute. Having not yet received the document, and with no parties present COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED, Trial Date STANDS at this time. 07/14/15 9:00 A.M. CONTINUED SAME Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Settlement conference held, no settlement reached.
Judge: Ellsworth, Carolyn |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.