Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cheatham, Karen filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 1997 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
October 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Consent And Waiver Of Individual Entitled To Receive The Citation To Appear And Show Cause - Christine Jones | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Consent And Waiver Of Individual Entitled To Receive The Citation To AppearAnd Show Cause - Jace Engles | |
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Notice of Hearing on Petition to Relocate Ward Judge: Norheim, Jon |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department B to Department E |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department H to Department B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.