Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rankin, Robin, Rankin, Pamela, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Fine, Frances A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1997 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department E to Department P |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT SCH/PER Date: 02/08/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCH/PER Date: 01/06/2006 Blackstone OC: | |
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 12/07/2005 Blackstone OC: | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order STIPULATION AND ORDER PERTAINING TO CUSTODY VISITATION CHILD SUPPORT ANDUNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES SCH/PER Date: 12/02/2005 Blackstone OC: |
|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: THERAPUTIC REUNIFICATION/ VISITATION Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: THERAPUTIC REUNIFICATION/ VISITATION SCH/PER Date: 11/08/2005 Blackstone OC: OC |
|
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing RETURN: CHILD INTERVIEW Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL CONDITION SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: | |
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 09/07/2005 Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.