Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Structural Control Inc, Layton, Don, Olson, James R, Olson, Candace C, filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Michael E Stoberski, against Stanton Construction Inc, Lakeside Landscape, Universal Polymer, Structural Control Inc, Stateline Development, (total of 11) See All represented by Theodore Parker, Pro Se, David L Riddle, Michael W. Caspino, James S. Savett, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Loehrer, Sally presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1997 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Destruction of Evidence and/or Depositions | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Release of Exhibits returned Pltf exhibits per court order |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Receipt of Exhibits | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Order for Return of Exhibits | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Order for Disposal of Exhibits | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MTN TO DEEM SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED /122 Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Reporter/Recorder: Mary Beth Cook Heard By: Sally Loehrer Mr. Jason Makris, Esq. Nevada Bar 11192, appearing for Mr. Stoberski. Matter argued and submitted. COURT ORDERED, Pltf's Motion is GRANTED, settlement agreement is DEEMED to be signed, CASE is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and CASE CLOSED. |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion PLTF'S MTN TO DEEM SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED /122 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.