Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Girten, David, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie Glass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 1995 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant Return - DTP Defendant present in custody. COURT NOTED Defendant is held on a bench warrant issued on 10/1/97. Upon Court's inquiry, Defendant stated he was in Arizona and moved back to Las Vegas three years ago and is employed. COURT ORDERED, matter REFERRED to the originating department due to the amount of time absconded. No return date for Drug Court set at this time pending outcome in the originating department. Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Return | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
April 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHANGE: ACTIVE TO WARRANT |
|
October 02, 1997 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant NO BAIL BENCH WARRANT ISSUED |
|
October 01, 1997 | Docket Event |
Drug Court Status Check STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM Court Clerk: NANCY NOBLE/nn Relief Clerk: MELISSA DAVIS Reporter/Recorder: SHARLEEN NICHOLSON Heard By: Jack Lehman COURT ORDERED, A BENCH WARRANT WILL ISSUE, NO BAIL. Fees waived while petitioner is an absconder. Further, $20.00 FINE IMPOSED. |
|
September 18, 1997 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.