Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lebario, Jose E, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Steven Altig, against Shaeli, Zenia, represented by James W Krah, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Robert W. Teuton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 1995 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department C Case reassigned from Judge Robert Teuton Dept D |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassignment from Judge Steel to Judge Hardcastle |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCH/PER Date: 01/08/2007 Blackstone OC: | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SCH/PER Date: 01/08/2007 Blackstone OC: | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: | |
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE: CUSTODY (HALF DAY) Judge: Steel, Cynthia Dianne) EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE: CUSTODY (HALF DAY |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Copy RECEIPT OF DEFENDANTS TRIAL EXHIBITS SCH/PER Date: 10/12/2006 Blackstone OC: |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF COPY SCH/PER Date: 10/12/2006 Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.