Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sonerholm, Alice M, Sonerholm, Jonell, Sonerholm, Layton J, Sonerholm, Lewis James, Sonerholm, Michael, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bryce C. Duckworth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 1990 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship Doc ID# 43 [43] ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Rule 10 Investigator's Report Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Confidential Report of AOC Investigator Doc ID# 42 [42] Confidential Report of Investigator |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-05 |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Death/Suggestion of Death Doc ID# 41 [41] Letter RE: Suggestion of Death |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Appoint State Investigator Doc ID# 40 [40] Order Appointing Investigator Pursuant to Rule 10 |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Rule 10 Doc ID# 39 [39] Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Rule 10 |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Compliance Doc ID# 38 [38] Notice of Non-Compliance |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Doc ID# 37 [37] Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Compliance Doc ID# 36 [36] 90G014107 NNC Patrick Jon Sonerholm 22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.