Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Darrell, Nona Sue, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 1990 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Final Discharge | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Settling Third and FInal Account and Report of Guardian Order Authorizing Payment of Fees and Order Discharging Guardian | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing for Account and Report Third And Final Account And Report Of Guardian, Petition For Payment Of Fees And Petition For Termination Of Guardianship Judge: Norheim, Jon |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Accounting Third and Final Account and Report of Guardian, Petition for Payment of Fees and Petition for Termination of Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.