Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cox, Horace J, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type TERMINATED FROM DRUG COURT |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: ELAINE YORK Heard By: Jennifer Elliott Petitioner present in custody. COURT NOTED Petitioner has had probation revoked in the underlying criminal case and ORDERED, Petitioner TERMINATED from the Drug Court Program. COURT ADVISED Petitioner of the Re Entry Program which he can apply for after serving six months in prison. COURT FURTHER ADVISED Petitioner to work out a payment plan for outstanding balance when released. CASE CLOSED. |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: Tristana Cox/kj Relief Clerk: Kimberly Jones Heard By: Thompson, J. Charles Petitioner not present. COURT NOTED, Petitioner has a Preliminary Hearing in Justice Court #6 today. FURTHER NOTED, Petitioner is being held on a Drug Court Bench Warrant and has a Revocation Hearing set in C238058 for 10/22 and another Preliminary Hearing set in Justice Court #10 for 10/26. COURT ORDERED, MATTER CONTINUED. Petitioner's presence is WAIVED for today's hearing. 10/27/09 10:30 AM BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: Tristana Cox/kj Relief Clerk: Kimberly Jones Heard By: Marren, Terrance P Petitioner present in Custody. CHOICES Representative present. COURT NOTED, Petitioner is being held on a Drug Court Bench Warrant for Failure to Appear at the 2/03/09 Status Check; has a Probation Violation allegation in C238058 with no hearing date set yet; a Felony Arraignment in Justice Court 6 set for 10/1 and a Preliminary Hearing set on 10/14 in Justice Court 10. COURT ORDERED, MATTER CONTINUED. 10/16/09 9:00 AM BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHANGE: WARRANT TO ACTIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.