Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
North Las Vegas City Of, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fabri, Alexandra, represented by Mace J. Yampolsky, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Valerie Adair presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal - Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeConversion Judgment Event Type |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Remittitur to the Lower Court MUNICIPAL COURT REMITTITUR |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: COMPLIANCE Court Clerk: April Watkins Reporter/Recorder: Kerry Esparza Heard By: Michelle Leavitt Mr. Yampolsky provided documentation indicating alcohol and drug education courses have been completed. Mr. Webster advised Deft. has stayed out of trouble. Colloquy regarding fees and fine. Mr. Webster requested matter be remanded to North Las Vegas for fees to be collected. COURT ORDERED, matter REMANDED for Deft. to pay $297.00 to North Las Vegas. |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: COMPLIANCE |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Sharon Chun Reporter/Recorder: Richard Kangas Heard By: Valerie Adair Both counsel appeared and stated they were prepared for a trial at this time; however, the previous court minutes did not reflect that. COURT SUGGESTED both counsel confer and if this cannot settle, a trial date will be set. MATTER TRAILED. Case recalled, with Judge Wall on the Bench. Ms. Ramsey stated this case has resolved and cited negotiations. DEFT. ALEXANDRA FABRI ARRAIGNED and PLEAD GUILTY TO AMENDED CHARGE: DISTURBING THE PEACE (M). COURT ACCEPTED plea and ORDERED, ADJUDGED DEFT FABRI GUILTY AS CHARGED, and SENTENCED as follows: In addition to the $200.00 Fine, Deft SENTENCED to serve NINETY (90) DAYS IN JAIL; SENTENCE SUSPENDED, PLACED ON INFORMAL PROBATION for as long as this case remains open. CONDITIONS: 1) Enter and complete drug counseling classes, at least eight hours; or to provide proof of completion of a recent drug treatment program, as approved by counsel today. 3) Stay out of trouble with no arrests other than traffic citations. COURT ADMONISHED Deft to stay out of trouble. She confirmed she understood. COURT FURTHER ORDERED, matter SET for STATUS CHECK in sixty (60) days. NIC 7/11/08 10:00 AM STATUS CHECK: COMPLIANCE (FINE/PROOF OF DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM/STAY OUT OF TROUBLE (DEPT XII) |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum SUBPOENA |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Dana Cooper Heard By: Villani, Michael Matter continued off the record. |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Cheryl Case Reporter/Recorder: Bev Sigurnik Heard By: Cory, Ken Mr. Yampolsky requested a continuance as negotiations are pending. There being no opposition, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing INITIAL APPEARANCE |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type SENTENCED TO $200 FINE $87 ADM $10 CFA, SUSP 180 DAYS W/CONDITIONS |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Appeal from Lower Court MISDEMEANOR APPEAL Fee $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.