Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rossi, Steven L, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 5 Reassigned From Judge Escobar - Dept 14 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Drug Court Status Check STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM Court Clerk: Tristana Cox/kj Relief Clerk: Kimberly Jones Heard By: Jennifer Elliott Petitioner present in Custody. CHOICES Representative present. COURT NOTED, Petitioner is serving 60 days in the Clark County Detention Center and he was dishonorably discharged from probation on 9/09/09 in Department 4, Case C232762 and Drug Court is no longer a condition of Petitioner's probation. COURT ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. Once Petitioner is released from custody, he is to make PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS with Court Administration to pay the remaining Drug Court balance of $400.00. |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type TERMINATED FROM DRUG COURT |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Drug Court Status Check STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM Court Clerk: Tristana Cox Heard By: Jennifer Elliott CHOICES Representative present. COURT NOTED, Petitioner was not present as he is in custody with a revocation hearing on 9/9 in Department 4. COURT ORDERED, Petitioner's appearance is WAIVED for today's proceedings. MATTER CONTINUED. 9/11/09 9:00 AM STATUS CHECK - DTP |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.