Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cruz, Ivan E, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie Glass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Escobar - Dept 14 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER RE: RECALL BENCH WARRANT Court Clerk: ELAINE YORK Heard By: Jennifer Elliott Having been advised by the Judicial Executive Assistant that the Petitioner received a Dishonorable Discharge from probation in the underlying criminal case, COURT ORDERED, bench warrant RECALLED; Petitioner CREDITED $30. COURT NOTED Petitioner is no longer able to participate in the Drug Court Program and ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: RECALL BENCH WARRANT |
|
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type TERMINATED FROM DRUG COURT |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHANGE: ACTIVE TO WARRANT |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.