Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duboef, Whitney, Duboef, Lawrence, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steven Barry Cohen, against Detail Design Llc, Campo-Morgan, Anita, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Case reassigned from Judge Abbi Silver Dept 15 |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Application for Default Judgment Ex Parte Application and Affidavit for Default Judgment |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Application for Default Judgment Ex Parte Application and Affidavit for Default Judgment Against Details Design, LLC |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED at request of counsel. CONTINUED TO: 3/10/2010 8:30 AM Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- DETAIL DESIGN LLC | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DETAILS DESIGN STUDIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.