Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas S. Shaddix, against Lam, David, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Case reassigned from Judge Abbi Silver Dept 15 |
|
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing: Dismissal there being no appearances, COURT ORDERED, case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Three Day Notice of Intent to Default NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - DAVID LAM | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED Fee $148.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.