Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Solano, Lorena, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by Anthony R Lopez, against Flying J Transportation Llc, Bell, Melvin D, represented by Michael M. Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Glass, Jackie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 30 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Jerry A. Wiese |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao Dept 20 |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Reassigned from Department 5 |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Notice of Entry of Order to Dismiss With Prejudice |
|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status Check The Court has been informed the documents have been signed, defendants were suppose to file them and plaintiff's counsel is calling the defense to figure out what is going on; therefore, ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. CONTINUED TO: 3/10/10 (CHAMBERS CALENDAR) Judge: Glass, Jackie |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Status Check The mediation has been post-poned to an unknown date after discovery and there has recently been a Stipulation And Order to extend discovery to 12/30/09; therefore, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED to mid-January for further status check. CONTINUED TO: 1/13/10 (CHAMBERS CALENDAR) Judge: Glass, Jackie |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Deposition Subpoena to Officer Mackinnon, Badge #438 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.