Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lindsey, Michelle, Estate Of Jonathan K Lindsey, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Daniel S. Simon, Esq, against Kish Pa-C, Anita L, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bixler, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2007 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Richard F. Scotti |
|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Mark B. Bailus |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Return of Money Order for Return of Monies on Deposit |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Medical/Dental Malpractice No attorneys present. The Med-Mal Status Check was conducted by Judge Jerry A. Wiese II. COURT ORDERED, CASE CLOSED. Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Medical/Dental Malpractice Vacated - per Judge Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions PLTF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION...DEFT BRIAN D. CRONK, PA-C'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DEFT BRIAN D. CRONK, PA-C'S COUNTERMOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL AND WAIVER OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND...DEFT BRIAN D. CRONK, PA'C'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME...PLTF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND LEAVE TO CONDUCT FURTHER COLLECTION DISCOVERY...STATUS CHECK: NEGOTIATIONS Mr. Juan stated everything is done on the side of Nevada Mutual. Mr. Simon called him and expressed his concern that Puneet Garg, Esq., Mr. Cronk's bankruptcy attorney and Mr. Cronk approve the settlement, sign the stipulation to dismiss this case, and dismiss the bankruptcy appeal. Following colloquy between Court and counsel, Mr. Simon requested the Court set a deadline to have everything accomplished. COURT ORDERED, the deadline will be this Friday, 7/12/13 at 5:00 P.M. FURTHER ORDERED, matter CONTINUED one week for status check, and if everything has been resolved, counsel's presence WAIVED. 7/17/13 @ STATUS CHECK: NEGOTIATIONS Judge: Bixler, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.