Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthew Q Callister, against Stone, Zorina, Stone, John, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeVoluntary Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Notice of Entry of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Default Judgment Against Zorina Stone and John Stone | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Against Zorina Stone and John Stone | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Zorina Stone and John Stone | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Memorandum of Costs |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Recusal - Dept. XX Court has a conflict with Mr. Callister. To avoid the appearance of impropriety and implied bias, this Court hereby disqualifies itself and ORDERS, this case be REASSIGNED at random. Judge: Wall, David |
|
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Default as to Defendant as to Defendant John Stone | |
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Default as to Defendant as to Defendant Zorina Stone |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.