Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bayport Town Center Associates Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by John Michael Sacco, against Medina, Jesus R, Lemke, Aninfa A, Crestline Financial And Marketing Srvs, represented by Benson Lee, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing COURT finds there are no appearances; finds no cause has been shown why this action should not be dismissed; and ORDERED, case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
February 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate Amended Certificate |
|
January 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Dismissal Hearing | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWERS OF DEFENDANTS CRESTLINE FINANCIAL AND MARKETING SERVICES CORPINC A CALIFORNIA CORP AND JESUS ROSELLO MEDINA INDIVIDUALLY A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | INITIAL APPEARANCE FEE DISCLOSURE | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Three Day Notice of Intent to Default THREE DAY NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.