Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oxbow Construction Llc, Latigo Condominium Unit Owners Assn, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Scott K Canepa, against Latigo At Silverado Llc, Claremont Latigo Llc, Werner, Michael B, U-Underground Utilico Llc, Tango Pools And Spas Llc, (total of 32) See All represented by Michael Cary Van, Carolyn Marie Broussard, Leonard T. Fink, Aviva Y Gordon, Eileen M Marks, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2007 |
CategoryConstruction Defect |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 22 Reassigned From Judge Williams - Dept 16 |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Good Faith Settlement Vacated - On in Error Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Defendant/Cross-Defendant Sunstate Companies, Inc.'s Request for an Order Shortening Time, Request to Place Settlement Terms on the Record, and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Joinder Third Party Defendants, R.A.M.M. Corporation and Expert Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc's Joinder to Oxbow Construction, LLC's Notice of Taking Deposition of Latigo Condominum Unit-Owners' Association Board of Director Robert Goldberg |
|
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Order Setting Settlement Conference Please Read and Comply with all Requirements of this Order | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Association of Counsel for Bradley Window Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.