Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, Laron, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thomas F. Christensen, against Ray, Pamela, Ludtke, Elliot, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Dept, represented by Dennis M Prince, Craig R. Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status Check COURT CLERK ROSHONDA MAYFIELD Attorney Anderson appeared on behalf of the Defendant and Counter Claimant. Further, counsel argued on behalf of this case being dismissed. No parties present of behalf of the other parties involved. Following representations by counsel, COURT ORDERED, Attorney Anderson's oral motion regarding dismissal GRANTED. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Dismissal Hearing | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Order of Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement DEFT PAMELA RAY'S MTN TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT/2 Court Clerk: Nancy Noble Heard By: Timothy Williams There being no opposition and service was proper, COURT ORDERED Motion GRANTED in the sum of $15,000. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Defendant Pamela Ray's Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement/2 |
|
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Counterclaim Defendant Counter Defendant Pamela Rays Answer to Counter Claimants Officer Elliott Ludtke and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Departments Counter Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.