Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lindsey, Joe, Hays, Jamie, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case represented by David B Matheny, against Alvarez, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Loehrer, Sally presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2007 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Heard By: Sally Loehrer COURT NOTED, Proof of Deposit on file, therefore ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. CASE CLOSED |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Blocked Account (Minor) | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Heard By: Sally Loehrer COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. COURT NOTED, Clerk of Court received telephone call regarding proof of deposit, however upon searching Court Staff found nothing. Court directed Law Clerk to advise counsel of the continuance date. |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Heard By: Sally Loehrer Colloquy regarding setting up account for minor child. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Court advised counsel the Clerk of Court can be designated to sign the check on behalf of the minor, should the parents not be willing to do such. |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Heard By: Sally Loehrer COURT NOTED, NO Proof of Deposit on file, therefore ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. Court directed Law Clerk to notify counsel. |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Court Clerk: Jennifer Kimmel Heard By: Sally Loehrer Mr. Matheny advised his client has the check and paperwork. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for THIRTY (30) DAYS; Court further advised if Mr. Matheny files proof before next date, he does not have to appear. |
|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Order of Approval of Minors Claim |
|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements | |
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Fee $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.