Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spendlove, Howard W, Griffin, Christian, Estate Of Inise Virginia Spendlove, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by George Maglares, against Valley Health System Llc, represented by Eric K. Stryker, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Miley, Stefany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiley, Stefany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2007 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Medical/Dental Malpractice The Med-Mal Status Check was conducted by a panel consisting of Chief Judge Jennifer Togliatti and Judge Jerry A. Wiese II. Counsel advised matter settled. COURT ORDERED, CASE CLOSED pending submission of settlement documents. Judge: s Wiese, Jerry A., Togliatti, Jennifer |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Check Counsel requested a continuance due to new rules with Medicare and the expected length of time it will take to get paperwork concluded with them. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. CONTINUED TO: 8/23/11 9:30AM Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Miley, Stefany |
|
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.